judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IVORINE WINT V. PRES. & DIRS. OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 11-AA-0155
Short Caption:IVORINE WINT V. PRES. & DIRS. OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES2976-10Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerIvorine WintYPro SeN
RespondentPres. & Dirs of Georgetown UniversityN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/14/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
02/24/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 14, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
02/24/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 24, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
06/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 1/11/11
06/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/05/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
08/02/2011FiledOrder - directing petitioenr to submit limited appendix. accompanied by a motion for leave to file.
08/18/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File the Appendix out of time (Petitioner)Granted
08/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File the Appendix out of time (Petitioner)
08/26/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/03/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Ivorine Wint (Petitioner)
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
03/07/2012FiledMotion to expedite decision (Petitioner)Denied as Moot
04/06/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ)
04/11/2012FiledOrder Denying as moot petitioner's motion to expedite decision.
04/30/2012FiledMandate