judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELIRA (MIGUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36392
Short Caption:DELIRA (MIGUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C165915Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11625
07/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeffrey Banks shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. This appeal shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C. 00-12473
07/31/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-13237
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On July 31, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint appellate counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and appellate counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of appellate counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellate counsel. Thereafter, appellate counsel shall have 10 days within which to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. Appellate counsel shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 40 days of the appointment or appearance of appellate counsel. 00-15018
09/29/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/14/00 appointing William J. Taylor as counsel for appellant. 00-17202
12/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 29, 2000, this court received a notice of appointment of William L. Taylor as counsel for appellant. To date, Taylor has failed to enter a notice of appearance, or communicate with this court in any manner regarding this appeal. Taylor shall, within 10 days of this order, file the fast track statement and appendix, or show cause why Taylor should not be sanctioned. 00-22637
01/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-00436
01/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-00438
01/30/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-02076
01/30/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-02077
02/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a request for the rough draft transcripts of the hearings on the following dates: May 8, 2000; May 10, 2000; June 2, 2000; and June 21, 2000. 01-03578
03/09/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/30/00, 4/10/00, 5/8/00, 5/10/00, 6/2/00, 6/21/00, Court Reporter: Freelance Court Reporters. Filed in district court on: March 2, 2001. 01-04310
04/17/2001Order/Procedural Order. To date, this court has not received copies of the requested rough draft transcripts dated: 3/30/00; 5/8/00; 5/10/00; 6/2/00; and 6/21/00. Freelance Court Reporters shall have 10 days form the date of this order to deliver certified copies of the requested rough draft transcripts to the clerk of this court or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed pursuant to NRAP 3C(n). 01-06549
05/02/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 2, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 01-07379
06/06/2001Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. On March 2, 2001, counsel for appellant filed in district court a request for rough draft transcripts of the proceedings in district court on the following dates: March 30, 2000; May 8, 2000; May 10, 2000; June 2, 2000; and June 21, 2000. fn1[Counsel also requested a rough draft transcript of the proceedings in district court on April 10, 2000. A transcript of that proceeding has already been provided to this court in the appendices filed by the parties.] On May 2, 2001, this court received a certified coy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on June 2, 2000. However, to date this court still has not received copies of the transcripts of the proceedings in district court on the following dates: March 30, 2000; May 8, 2000; May 10, 2000; and June 21, 2000. Additionally, Freelance Court Reporters has not responded to the order to show cause. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanctions is appropriate. Freelance Court Reporters shall pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library within 20 days of the date of this order and shall have 10 days from the date of this order to deliver copies of the requested rough draft transcripts for the above-mentioned proceedings to the clerk of this court or show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed. 01-09415
06/15/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Leta Haupt in response to this court's order filed 6/6/01. 01-10047
07/02/2001Other Other. Received returned certified envelope addressed to Leta Haupt Free Lance Court Reporter containing a copy of the order filed June 6, 2001. The envelope is stamped as "Returned to Sender, Unclaimed".
08/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We vacate the order directing Freelance Court Reporters to pay a monetary sanction of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library. William Taylor shall have 5 days from the date of this order within which to file with the district court and serve upon court reporter Margaret Cardwell a request for the rough draft transcripts of the proceedings in district court on the following dates: March 30, 2000; May 8, 2000; May 10, 2000; and June 21, 2000. Mr. Taylor shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file with the clerk of this court two file-stamped copies of the rough draft transcript request form and proof of service of the form upon court reporter Cardwell and opposing counsel. 01-14414
09/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/30/00; 5/8/00; 5/10/00; and 6/21/00. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 01-15144
09/28/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Margaret Cardwell. Court Reporter: April 10, 2000. 01-16379
11/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19205
12/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19538
12/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19538