judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION v. JOLLEY, CASTILLO, DRENNON, LTD., d/b/a SIERRA ENGINEERING

Case Heading (S-09-0175)
Case Number:S-09-0175Case Docketed On:09/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION v. JOLLEY, CASTILLO, DRENNON, LTD., d/b/a SIERRA ENGINEERING
Full Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE COMMISSION, Appellant (Respondent), v. JOLLEY, CASTILLO, DRENNON, LTD., d/b/a SIERRA ENGINEERING, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Unemployment Insurance DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
William Larry Weaver
Matthew J. Fermelia
AppelleeJolley, Castillo, Drennon, Ltd., d/b/a Sierra EngineeringStephenson Dow Emery

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Taxation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 48
Citation:229 P.3d 955

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/08/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/22/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Respondent, Wyoming Department of Employment, Unemployment Insurance Commission and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/14/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Weaver for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephenson Emery for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William L. Weaver for appellant; Stephenson D. Emery for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remandingOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/10/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal