judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0134
Short Caption:BOBBY JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-15607-09Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/20/2013Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:02/28/2014
Argued/Submitted:10/24/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/29/2015

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
David P. SayboltYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sydney Jean Hoffman, Esquire, ishereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sydney Jean Hoffman, Esquire
03/23/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-134 and 11-CF-228 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Corylee Carlyle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn in appeal no. 11-CF-228. F/O that counsel for appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to theappeal have been ordered an shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appelalnt must advise the Court Reporting and recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/01/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (Johnson)(no oppo).
04/01/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Statement Regarding Transcript (Johnson).
04/05/2011 On consideration of appellant Bobby Johnson's unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant Johnson's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn's statement regarding transcript remain due on or before April 22, 2011. (Castillo)
04/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)-Bobby Johnson
04/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (VAUGHN) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/26/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CF-363 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 11-CF-134 and 11-CF-228 for all purposes herein. F/O, sua sponte, that the appointment of Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Tom Paynter, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant Bobby Johnson in appeal no. 11-CF-134 herein. Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to appeal no. 11-CF-134 to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that Sal Pilchen, Esquire and Amanda R. Grier, Esquire, are hereby assigned as pro bono counsel representing appellant Carl S. Morton in appeal no. 11-CF-363. F/O that counsel for appellant Carl S. Morton shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of thisorder complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (ETW)
05/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11CF363) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/09/2011APPEARANCE of Thomas C. Paynter as counsel for Appellant (Counsel was already on this case for Appellant).
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (19 pgs/Jeon) 7/26/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (227 pgs/Zamora) 7/27/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (114 pgs/Zamora) 7/28/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (61 pgs/Zamora) 7/29/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (36 pgs/Coney) 8/2/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (45 pgs/Coney) 8/3/10 proc w/cd
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #7 (16pgs/Tape) 4/23/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #8 (30pgs/Tape) 6/25/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #9 (25pgs/Etekochay) 10/22/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #10 (15pgs/Price) 3/18/11 proc.
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-363)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-363)
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (SEALED pleadings)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-228)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-228)
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (124 pgs.Janifer) 11/2/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (178 pgs/Janifer) 11/3/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (179-375 pgs/Janifer) 11/4/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (232 pgs/Shelton) 11/5/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (157 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 11/9/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (12 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 11/10/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (112 pgs/White) 1/14/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (59 pgs/Hamilton) 2/11/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (17 pgs/tape) 2/16/11 proc w/cd
08/18/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (SEALED PLEADINGS)
08/18/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-134)
08/18/2011FiledRecord Index (11-cf-134)
09/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/23/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte severing appeal no. 11-CF-134 from consolidated appeals nos. 11-CF-228 & 11-CF-363.
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 1/3/12.
01/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/5/12.
03/05/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw Under AndersGranted
03/21/2012FiledORDER THAT APPELLANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE NO LATER THAN APRIL 23, 2012
03/21/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)//RESPONSE//
04/19/2012FiledAnders Response (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledMotion and affidavit for leave to file an interim voucher (Appellant)Denied
07/31/2012FiledORDER DENYING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO SUBMIT AN INTERIM VOUCHER
08/09/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (14 pgs/tape) 8/2/10 proc. w/cd
08/10/2012FiledORDER GRANTING the MOTION TO WITHDRAW to the EXTENT THAT the APPOINTMENT OF THOMAS PAYNTER IS VACATED and EREK BARRON IS APPOINTED and F/O THAT APPELLANT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/N 60 DAYS
08/20/2012FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
08/20/2013FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/n 20 days.
08/20/2013FiledSupplemental Record - #23 (29 pgs/tape) 1/6/11 proc.
08/20/2013FiledRecord Completed
08/29/2013VacatedBriefing Order
09/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/20/2013FiledOrder Granting MOET on or before 10/8/2013, and vacating the 8/29/13 briefing order.
10/11/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/15/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
10/15/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/15/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/13/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/22/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 1/14/14
12/31/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/04/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant) to 2/14/14
02/14/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/26/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 2/28/14
02/28/2014FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/28/2014FiledBriefing Completed
03/18/2014FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
03/26/2014FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record (Appellee
03/28/2014FiledSupplemental Record - #24 (Superior Courts Filings/Orders dated 7/27/10)
04/15/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/30/2014FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/04/2014LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/08/2014FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Granted
08/18/2014FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to reschedule oral argument.
08/18/2014FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/28/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/21/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/24/2014FiledArgued before Associate Judge Fisher, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Nebeker. (Erek L. Barron, Esq. for appellant) (David P. Saybolt, Esq. for appellee)
01/29/2015FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Nebeker, Senior Judge)
02/11/2015FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
03/11/2015FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
03/24/2015FiledAnswer/Response to appellant's petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee)
05/21/2015FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
05/29/2015FiledMandate
06/01/2015FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)