judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ (ESTEBAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36391
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ (ESTEBAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35462 , 36916 , 40117 , 60246 , 67607 , 68356 , 70205 , 71171 , 71171-COA , 74843 , 74843-COA , 76410 , 76410-COA , 80044 , 80502 , 82035
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152619Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11596
08/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal is premature, and we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to appeal from a final, written order of the district court denying his petition. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13424
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13703
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13703