judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VANESSA SORENSEN v. STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee

Case Heading (S-09-0174)
Case Number:S-09-0174Case Docketed On:09/03/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:VANESSA SORENSEN v. STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee
Full Title:VANESSA SORENSEN, Petitioner, v. STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerVanessa SorensenRobert Todd Ingram
RespondentState Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyBillie Ruth Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Insurance Law, Negligence, Other
Opinion Number:2010 WY 101
Citation:234 P.3d 1233 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/03/2009Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
09/17/2009Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
09/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's opposition to petition for writ of review.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/16/2009Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2010Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Respondent's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Petitioner, requested signed original copy of Reply Brief.EventPhone CallFinal
01/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - signed original copy of Petitioner's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Todd Ingram for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie Ruth Edwards for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (R. Todd Ingram for appellant; Billie Ruth Edwards for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/20/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/05/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/05/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/09/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/6/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal