judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODOLFO CRUZ V. DC DEP'T CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRS

Case Information: 11-AA-0133
Short Caption:RODOLFO CRUZ V. DC DEP'T CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Dept of Consumer & Regulatory Affairs (DCRA)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DCRAI702882-10Filed Date:02/08/2011

Opening Event Date:02/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRodolfo Cruz NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/08/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/08/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
02/18/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
02/23/2011FILING FEE
03/07/2011 On consideration of the lodged petitionf or review, and it appearing that petitioner has tendered the $100 fee, it is ORDERED that the lodged petitionf or review is filed nunc pro tunc to February 8, 2011. It is F/O that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH
09/26/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
09/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/13/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/30/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
12/29/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/29/2011FiledDismissed
01/23/2012FiledMandate