judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER JENKINS V. GREG PAPPAS

Case Information: 11-CV-0168
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER JENKINS V. GREG PAPPASClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0167 Consolidated:11-CV-0168
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB305-11Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/28/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/29/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Jenkins YPro SeN
AppelleeGreg Pappas NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011 ORDERED, SS, that appeals NOS 11CV167 AND 11CV168 ARE CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why thes appeals should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED... (BY: ETW)
03/16/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- to court order
03/31/2011 ORDERED that the FEBRUARY 28, 2011 OTSC IS DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE******
03/31/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) LW
04/05/2011RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED FOR 2/4/11) (elp)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (8-pgs/tape 2/4/11 proc.)w/cd
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES 11cv167
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv167
04/28/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv168
04/28/2011RECORD COPIES 11cv168
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/18/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WAIVE APPENDIX
05/19/2011TMC - motion to waive appendix
06/02/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE APPENDIX REQUIREMENT IS GRANTED to the extent that appellant must only file those documents required by DC App. R. 30(f)(2001) W/N 20 DAYS...SEE HARDCOPY. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES shall file their briefs 30 days from the date the limited appendix is filed. (RZTHNB) RM
06/03/2011APPENDIX
07/13/2011FiledOrder directing appellees' brief, accompanied by a motion for leave
07/28/2011FiledReceived -RETURNED MAIL - This court's order of 7/13/11, mailed to appellant and appellees returned by the U.S. Postal Office as undeliverable and filed this date. elp (Appellant Jenkins, Appellee Hail)
08/08/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and appellant's brief alone
08/08/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/16/2011FiledReceived - Returned Mail - Order dated 8/8/11, mailed to appellant Christopher Jenkins at the most recent address on record - 950 Brentwood Road, NE, Washington, DC 20018, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date. elp (Appellant)
08/23/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From aplt (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From - Christopher Jenkins to the following: 950 Brentwood Rd, N.E., Washington, DC 20018 (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/28/2012FiledSubmitted To Washington,Fisher,King
03/21/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Remanding Record
07/11/2012FiledSupplemental Record #1 (sua sponte order-Judge Rankin filed 7/3/12)
03/04/2013FiledOrder directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot.
03/13/2013FiledReceived - Returned Mail from the U.S. Postal Office marked as "undeliverable" - Order dated 3/4/13, to appellant Christopher Jenkins at the most recent address on record - 950 Brentwood Road, NE, Washington, DC 20018. Remailed to different address - 1400 L St., N.W., Washington, DC 20005. aj (Appellant)
05/03/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing this appeal.
05/03/2013FiledDismissed as moot
05/29/2013FiledMandate