Case Information: 36426 | |||
Short Caption: | SASHINGER, JR. (HENRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR95P2854A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/14/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-12211 | |
08/04/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Janet Schmuck shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 00-13508 | |
08/09/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 00-13830 | |
08/09/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-13851 | |
08/29/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On August 9, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a motion to withdraw as appellant's attorney of record. Counsel may not withdraw until he or she has fulfilled the obligations set forth in NRAP 3C(b). The motion is therefore denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order. | 00-15133 | |
09/26/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-17008 | |
09/26/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 00-17010 | |
10/17/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-18382 | |
11/15/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded it is without merit, " . . . we affirm the order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-20016 | |
12/06/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On November 6, 2000, appellant filed a proper person motion for an extension of time to file a reply brief. Appellant has neither sought nor been granted leave to file proper person documents with this court. Nevertheless, we have taken appellant's motion under consideration. As an order of affirmance was entered in this matter on November 15, 2000, we deny appellant's motion as moot. | 00-21327 | |
12/12/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20139 | |
12/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/22/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 15, 2000. | 00-20139 |