judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ABREGO (JORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36425
Short Caption:ABREGO (JORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - 004323Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/09/2001 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/09/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12181
07/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: April 26, 2000 to April 28, 2000 and June 19, 2000. Court Reporter: Barbara Johnson. Filed in district court on: July 12, 2000. 00-12182
08/10/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/3/00, 4/26/00, 4/27/00, 6/19/00. Court Reporter: Barbara J. Johnson. 00-13942
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14645
08/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14646
09/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15587
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-16574
10/30/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/30/00. 00-19115
12/04/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/30/00. 00-21101
01/02/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 1, 2001. 01-00059
02/01/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-02175
02/05/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before March 5, 2001. 01-02269
03/05/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 01-03997
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including April 3, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-04423
04/04/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. One day requested. 01-05791
04/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Unforeseeable circumstances having been shown, we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on April 4, 2001. 01-06138
04/10/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Hand delivered: 04/04/01. 01-05792
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 8, 2001, at 9:30 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
08/29/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. 01-14664
09/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. We grant appellant's motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for October 8, 2001, at 9:30 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument on October 9, 2001, at 11:30 a.m., in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 01-15737
09/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
01/24/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6. NNP02. 02-01614
02/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02034
02/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2002. 02-02034