judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLEO COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0187)
Case Number:S-09-0187Case Docketed On:09/28/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CLEO COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CLEO COOPER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCleo Cooper Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 22
Citation:225 P.3d 1070

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2009Order - Granting in forma pauperisOrderGranting in forma pauperisFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/09/2009Motion - Appointment of counselMotionAppointment of counselFinal
10/09/2009Event - Phone Call - AG will not respond to motionEventPhone CallFinal
10/27/2009Order - Denying Motion for Appointment of CounselOrderDenyFinal
11/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Prior Supreme Court Record S-07-0018; Volumes IV-V, Prior Supreme Court Record S-07-0049.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/19/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/23/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/22/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal