judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ VS. SIEVERS C/W 34580

Case Information: 34932
Short Caption:CHAVEZ VS. SIEVERS C/W 34580Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34580 *, 34932Related Case(s): 34580
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9708666Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/08/1999 / Rosenauer, CeciliaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09614
10/06/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/06/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cecilia Rosenauer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: October 11, 1999. 99-09953
02/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, submit the required filing fee or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. Mailed order to attorney Dickerson by regular and certified mail. 00-02257
02/16/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jeffrey A. Dickerson-check no. 5181.
02/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-02780
02/28/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of Execution and an Order Providing for Bond Less than Judgment. 00-03141
03/03/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay of Execution and Order Providing for Bond Less than Judgment. 00-03368
03/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. For Stay of Execution. Appellant has moved for a stay of execution and an order providing for a bond less than judgment. We deny the motion. 00-04161
04/17/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing sttement for each appeal; 120 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Two copies of the docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). Nos. 34932, 34580. 00-06109
04/28/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-07000
05/01/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 34932, 34580. 00-07064
05/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Address for Jeffrey A. Dickerson. Nos. 34580, 34932. 00-07656
08/11/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/11/00 (Reno/Carson). (Nos. 34580 & 34932.) (00-14072)
08/11/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (Nos. 34580 & 34932). (00-14073)
09/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 9/8/00 (Reno/Carson). Nos. 34580 & 34932. (00-15839)
09/15/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. for answering brief. Nos. 34580/34932
09/20/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 9/20/00 (Reno/Carson). Nos. 34580 & 34932. 00-16644
11/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. Nos. 34580, 34932. Document No. 00-19588.
11/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/11/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Jeffrey A. Dickerson. 01-15347
04/12/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Shearing, J. We concur, Young, Agosti, and Becker, JJ. Rose, J., with whom Maupin, C.J., and Leavitt, J., agree, concurring. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. EN BANC. Nos. 34580/34932. 02-06542
04/26/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/26/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Delivered on: 04/26/02. Nos. 34580/34932 (02-07469)
05/07/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). EN BANC. Nos. 34580/34932. 02-08011
05/22/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08033
05/22/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2002. 02-08033
06/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's petition for rehearing was filed in these consolidated appeals on April 26, 2002. To date, appellant has failed to pay the filing fee. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $100 filing fee to the clerk of this court. Nos. 34580/34932 (02-09756)
09/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. As of the date of this order, appellant has not submitted the filing fee for the petition for rehearing. We again direct appellant to pay the $100 filing fee within 10 days from the date of this order or to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. Nos. 34580/34942. (02-15196)
09/05/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Law Office of Jeffrey A. Dickerson--check no. 7509. Nos. 34580/34932