judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. MARTIN FREEMAN, ETAL

Case Information: 11-CV-0183
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. MARTIN FREEMAN, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-1219 Consolidated: 10-CV-1510 , 10-CV-1511 , 11-CV-0166 , 11-CV-0183, 11-CV-0324
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2153-05Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeMartin Freeman N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeRobert F. Grooms N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeTheodore Anderson, Jr.N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeAntonio Williams N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeHilliard Dean N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeKevin Tolson N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeDuane Fowler N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeBilly A. Robin N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeSean Mclaughlin N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeFaternal Order of PoliceN
Anthony M. ContiNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX - (11-CV-183)
04/01/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for appeals nos. 11-CV-183 and 11-CV-324, and it further appearing that complete records on appeal have been filed with this court, it is (MORE)
04/01/2011 ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-183 and 11-CV-324 are consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1219, 10-Cv-1510, 10-Cv-1511 & 11-CV-166 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
04/01/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including opening brief of cross appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellants/cross- appellees Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellants/cross-appellees. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/11/2011APPENDIX (Volume I & II)
06/09/2011APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (D.C.)
06/20/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to the motion of the aple cross aplt to enlarge the dealine for filing its brief for and additional 60 days
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellee/cross- appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee/cross-appellant's brief shall be filed on or before August 12, 2011. (ETW) elp
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
08/24/2011FiledOpposition cross aple to the secon motion of the aple/cross aplt d.c. to enlarge the deadline for filing its brief for an additional 30 days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
09/19/2011FiledOpposition - to aple/corss aplt's motion for enlargement of time for an additional three days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
09/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and the lodged supplemental joint appendix (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant) w/ supplemental joint appendix (two separate pleadings) elp
10/06/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin)
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/27/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
11/10/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
11/10/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Easterly, Epstein
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Judges Glickman, Easterly, Epstein0
11/29/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)Denied
03/14/2013FiledOrder Denying appellants/cross-appellee's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
03/22/2013FiledMandate