judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEE W. SANNING v. JAMISON PIKE SANNING

Case Heading (S-09-0202)
Case Number:S-09-0202Case Docketed On:10/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LEE W. SANNING v. JAMISON PIKE SANNING
Full Title:LEE W. SANNING, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMISON PIKE SANNING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLee W. SanningSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeJamison Pike SanningDevon P. O'Connell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2010 WY 78
Citation:233 P.3d 922 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion in District Court for Appellant to Post BondNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2009Service - Amended Certificate of Service (not e-filed)ServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appeal from counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/19/2010Brief - Appellee with statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/08/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript, Deposition & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/15/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/01/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/01/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal