judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, IN RE: RECOMMENDED TERMINATION OF EMPLOYMENT OF GLENDA R. REYNOLDS: GLENDA R. REYNOLDS v. WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-09-0201)
Case Number:S-09-0201Case Docketed On:10/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, IN RE: RECOMMENDED TERMINATION OF EMPLOYMENT OF GLENDA R. REYNOLDS: GLENDA R. REYNOLDS v. WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Full Title:WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, IN RE: RECOMMENDED TERMINATION OF EMPLOYMENT OF GLENDA R. REYNOLDS: GLENDA R. REYNOLDS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WEST PARK HOSPITAL DISTRICT, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGlenda R. ReynoldsG. Mark Garrison
AppelleeWest Park Hospital DistrictChris Dull Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Employment Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 69
Citation:231 P.3d 1275

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/25/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee West Park Hospital DistrictEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Chris Dull Edwards for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - G. Mark Garrison for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (G. Mark Garrison for appellant; Chris Dull Edwards for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/27/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/16/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal