judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAGDALENE CAMPBELL, ET AL V. FORT LINCOLN NEW TOWN CORP.,

Case Information: 11-CV-0179
Short Caption:MAGDALENE CAMPBELL, ET AL V. FORT LINCOLN NEW TOWN CORP.,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7132-02Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/26/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMagdalene Campbell N
Jane M. Liu NN
Bruce J. TerrisYN
AppellantFort Lincoln Civil AssociationN
Jane M. Liu YN
Bruce J. TerrisNN
AppelleeFort Lincoln New Town CorporationN
Frederick Cooke, Jr.YY
AppelleeFort Lincoln Realty CorporationN
Frederick Cooke, Jr.YY
AppelleeMichele V. Hagans N
Frederick Cooke, Jr.YY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED... (BY: ETW)
03/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE aplt
03/10/2011 ORDERED that this court's FEBRUARY 28, 2011, OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE******
03/10/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) LW
03/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/14/10, 11/15/10 & 11/16/10) (elp)
05/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (29-pgs/tape 10/14/10 proc.)
05/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (143-pgs/price 11/15/10proc)
05/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (35-pgs/price 11/16/10 proc.)w/cd
05/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/02/2011RECORD INDEX
07/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellant Campbell)
07/11/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant Campbell)
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Fort Lincoln New Town Corporation, Appellee Fort Lincoln Realty Corporation, Appellee Hagans)
08/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/02/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant Campbell, Appellant Fort Lincoln Civil Association)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/14/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Easterly, Farrell Bruce J. Terris, Esq. for appellant Frederick Cooke, Jr., Esq. for appellee
10/04/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
10/17/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees and Fort Lincoln Civic Association (Appellant Campbell)Granted
10/23/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS AND FEES
10/26/2012FiledMandate
11/15/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS