judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 28896
Short Caption:MOORE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39387 , 52856 , 56259 , 57969 , 64170 , 74553 , 78985
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120400Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/12/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/1996MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
08/02/1996Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 23, 1996, to cause transmission of the record on appeal to the clerk of this court. We remind court reporter Mary Malone that she "has a duty expeditiously to prepare, and punctually to deliver, all transcripts" designated for inclusion in the record on appeal. We caution Malone that her continued failure to discharge this duty may result in the imposition of sanctions. Fn1[Counsel for appellant shall serve a copy of this order on court reporter Malone and shall file proof of such service within 7 days from the date of this order].
08/08/1996Other Other. Filed Declaration of Mailing a copy of the Supreme Court Order to Mary Malone, Court Reporter.
09/23/1996Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6 (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for Appellant).
10/03/1996Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/30/1996BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express - no postmark.
11/20/1996BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail - no postmark.
12/20/1996BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail - no postmark.
03/12/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
03/12/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/1999Other Other. Resubmitted to Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
03/10/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 29. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 02-03762
04/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000.