judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW KYLE ENDRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0189)
Parent: S-09-0188 Case Docketed On:09/28/2009
Consolidated:S-09-0189
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:MATTHEW KYLE ENDRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW KYLE ENDRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Kyle EndrisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 73
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/13/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/16/2009Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
12/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to consolidate appealsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/18/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
01/12/2010Motion - Supplemental briefing by Appellant (pro se)MotionSupplemental briefingFinal
01/26/2010Order - Denying Motion to File Pro se Supplemental BriefOrderDenyFinal
01/27/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven total volumes. District Court Case No. CR2008-12: Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder. District Court Case No. CR2008-64: Volume IV, Original Papers; Volumes V-VI, Transcripts; Volume VII, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counself for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 6/4/10 by agent for warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal