Case Information: 31212 | |||
Short Caption: | PREMO VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C125306 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/21/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/16/1997 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/16/1997 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
11/05/1997 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
11/13/1997 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. To transmit required document to Clark County Clerk. Due date: 10 days. (Judgment filed 10/24/97.) | ||
11/17/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. To file transcript request. | ||
11/17/1997 | Other | Other. Received request for transcript of proceedings. | ||
11/19/1997 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Received Documents from District Court Clerk. A certified copy of the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. Filed in the district court October 24, 1997. | ||
11/25/1997 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time. The clerk shall forthwith file the "Request for Transcript of Proceedings" provisionally submitted on November 17, 1997. | ||
11/25/1997 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Pauline May. | ||
02/23/1998 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. That appellant shall have to and including March 25, 1998, to file the opening brief. | ||
03/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Court reporter Pauline May shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file the requested transcript or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the immediate imposition of sanctions pursuant to NRAP 13(b). | ||
03/23/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. To file opening brief and appendix. | ||
03/25/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for extension of time, to and including April 30, 1998, to file the opening brief. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | ||
03/25/1998 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 8/20/97 Court reporter: Pauline C. May. | ||
05/04/1998 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's opening brief. (Mailed on: 4/29/98.) | ||
05/04/1998 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Joint Appendix Vols. 1 and 2. | ||
06/02/1998 | Brief | Filed Brief. Respondent's answering brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.) | ||
06/02/1998 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's appendix. | ||
07/06/1998 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. That appellant shall have to and including July 20, 1998, to file the reply brief. | ||
07/22/1998 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's reply brief. (Mailed on: 7/21/98.) | ||
07/22/1998 | Other | Other. Case submitted on briefs this day. | ||
12/21/1999 | Other | Other. Resubmitted to the Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | ||
12/21/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/02/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | ||
03/20/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. To file petition for rehearing. (Mailed on 3/17/00.) | ||
04/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's unopposed motion. Appellant shall have 18 days from the date of this order to file and serve the petition for rehearing. | ||
04/26/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. (Mailed on 4/25/00--LV drop box.) | ||
08/11/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14037 | |
08/29/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14102 | |
08/29/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/06/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. | 00-14102 |