judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERIC SCHOUBOE v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-09-0190)
Case Number:S-09-0190Case Docketed On:09/28/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:ERIC SCHOUBOE v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:ERIC SCHOUBOE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEric SchouboeGerard R. Bosch
Mark Jonathan Longfield
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Douglas J. Moench
Robin Sessions Cooley
Kenneth J. Miller

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2010 WY 119
Citation:238 P.3d 1246

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/12/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Wyoming Department of Transportation and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/26/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/19/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/10/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal