judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIANA COLOMBO V. NADEEM WAEEN

Case Information: 11-FM-0170
Short Caption:ADRIANA COLOMBO V. NADEEM WAEENClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3985-10Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdriana Colombo YPro SeN
AppelleeN. W.N
Alan B. SoschinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011RECORD INDEX
02/28/2011RECORD COPIES
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
02/28/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (122 pgs/tape) 12/27/10 proc. w/cd
03/02/2011error
03/07/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
03/16/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY filed... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transmit a copy of the RESPONSE to Superior court to be filed as a motion for excusable neglect...If the court grants the motion for an extension of time, appellant may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/16/2011DISMISSED
04/08/2011MANDATE ISSUED