judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4523
A-4523
02/18/1954
MISC PETITION
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
E. A. ETHEREDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/24/1955Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/07/1955Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/20/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/31/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/05/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/28/1955Order from Lower Court filed
01/24/1955Response to Brief filed
01/07/1955Brief on the Merits
12/31/1954Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court CostsFiling granted
11/30/1954Response to Motion filed
11/20/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1954Supplemental Brief filed
03/24/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/24/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1954Reply to Response
02/27/1954Response to Petition
02/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
E. A. EtheredgeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information