judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON VS. DIRECTOR

Case Information: 30277
Short Caption:JOHNSON VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C121098Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/14/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
04/17/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
04/24/1997Other Other. Filed Notice of Filing Certified Copies of Case Appeal Statement.
04/24/1997Other Other. Received certified copies of Case Appeal Statement.
04/25/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter Yvonne Valentin.
04/30/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/04/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, either (1) enter a written judgment denying appellant's petition or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering appellant's petition. In the event the district court enters a written order (or has already entered a written order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court.
06/12/1997Order/IncomingReceived District Court Order. from district court clerk, certified copy of district court order filed April 29, 1997.
08/06/1997MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 11, 1997.
09/15/1997BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 9/10/97
09/15/1997AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 5. (Mailed on 9/10/97)
10/14/1997BriefFiled Answering Brief. Express mail--no postmark.
10/14/1997AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Appendix. Express mail--no postmark.
11/10/1997MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 10, 1997.
12/11/1997BriefFiled Reply Brief. No postmark.
08/31/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Thomas C. Naylor.
09/21/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Thomas C. Naylor.
09/24/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Thomas C. Naylor.
12/21/1999Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Resubmitted to Southern Nevada Panel this day.. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-22759
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
04/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2000.