judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES A. HERRERA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0191)
Case Number:S-09-0191Case Docketed On:09/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JAMES A. HERRERA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:JAMES A. HERRERA, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames A. HerreraDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kristen Jocelyn Hanna

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 103
Citation:236 P.3d 277 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/30/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant James A. HerreraEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substition of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in trial courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Petitioner, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/21/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/26/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/03/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal