judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JALAL ASKANDER V. RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0171
Short Caption:JALAL ASKANDER V. RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6365-10Filed Date:02/06/2011

Opening Event Date:02/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJalal Askander N
Paul Wolf YN
AppelleeResearch Triangle Institute InternationalN
Leslie Paul MachadoYY
Robert F. Reklaitis NN
AppelleeUnity Resources Group LLCN
Matthew T. EggerdingNN
Kevin J. Walsh YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 6, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDEREd for 2/4/11) (elp)
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (123-pgs/tape 2/4/11 proc.)w/cd
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/14/2011RECORD INDEX
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/07/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE of Kelvin J. Walsh on behalf of Appellee (no oppo)dwm Granted
04/08/2011APPEARANCE - of Robert F. Reklaitis on behalf of the aple
04/18/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of Matthew T. Edderling, Esquire, counsel for appellee Unity Resources Group, LLC. requesting that the appearance of Kevin J. Walsh, Esquire, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of appellee Unity Resources Group, LLC., it is ORDERED that the motion of Matthew T. Eggerding, esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Kevin J. Walsh, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of appellee Unity Resources Group, LLC., it is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix remain due to be filed with this court on or before April 25, 2011. (ETW) elp
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/18/2011APPENDIX exhibits to appendix
05/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Research Triangle Institute)
05/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Unity Resourses Group,LLC)
05/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/06/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 filed by: Attorney Kevin J.Walsh aple
07/13/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee Unity Resources Group LLC)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/13/2011FiledMotion for additional five minutes of oral argument (Appellant Askander, Appellee Research Triangle Institute International, Appellee Unity Resources Group LLC)
11/01/2011FiledOrder Granting joint motion for additional time for oral argument.
11/07/2011FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Steadman Paul Wolf, Esquire Leslie Paul Machado, Esquire Kevin J. Walsh, Esquire
11/07/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate