Case Information: 77087 | |||
Short Caption: | VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (ANDERSON) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A668979 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Cadish | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/03/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Michael M. Edwards. | ||
10/03/2018 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioner Venetian Casino Resort, LLC dba Palazzo Casino Resort's Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Mandamus Under NRAP 27(e). | 18-38646 | |
10/03/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 18-38647 | |
11/15/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC) | 18-904441 | |
12/14/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: December 31, 2018. (SC) | 18-908845 | |
01/02/2019 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party in Interest's Response to Petitioners Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Mandamus Under NRAP 27(e) (Answer to Writ Petition). (SC) | 19-00073 | |
01/02/2019 | Appendix | Filed Real Party in Interest's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | 19-00074 | |
01/09/2019 | Other | Justice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC) | ||
01/15/2019 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Response to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Mandamus Under NRAP 27(e). (SC) | 19-02133 | |
07/12/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC) | 19-29661 | |
08/06/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC). | 19-32947 | |
08/06/2019 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). |