Case Heading (S-09-0198) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0198 | Case Docketed On: | 10/09/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Converse County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901 | ||
Short Title: | ALYSSA STEWART v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | ALYSSA STEWART, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Alyssa Stewart | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | 2010 WY 16 |
Citation: | 223 P.3d 1291 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/09/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/09/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/09/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Record - Received unfiled record | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/30/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/14/2009 | Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw | Order | Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw | Final | |
02/02/2010 | Brief - Failure to file - appellant's Anders brief. | Brief | Failure to file - appellant | Final | |
02/18/2010 | Opinion - Published order | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
03/08/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
03/08/2010 | Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerk | Record | Returned unfiled record | Final | |
03/08/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
03/08/2010 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/17/2010 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/16/10. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |