judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, ET AL. v. DR. WENDELL E. PIERCE

Case: A-4514
A-4514
02/15/1954
Application for Writ of Error
WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, ET AL.
DR. WENDELL E. PIERCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/23/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/23/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/21/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/21/1954Letter brief Petitioner
05/13/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/13/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/25/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/15/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/23/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/24/1954Response to Motion filed
07/23/1954Response to Petition
07/21/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/07/1954Opinion issued
05/21/1954Letter brief
05/13/1954Supplement to Response
05/13/1954Supplemental Brief filed
04/20/1954Letter Filed
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
02/25/1954Reply to Response
02/15/1954Brief in Support of Petition
02/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/15/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Wendell E. PierceRespondent
Westinghouse Electric Corporation, et al.Petitioner
Joe H. Tonahill and Jerry P. FortenberryAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information