judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EMILY BLOOMER v. JEFFREY BLOOMER

Case Heading (S-09-0197)
Case Number:S-09-0197Case Docketed On:10/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:EMILY BLOOMER v. JEFFREY BLOOMER
Full Title:EMILY BLOOMER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JEFFREY BLOOMER, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEmily BloomerRichard J. Mulligan
AppelleeJeffrey BloomerKenneth S. Cohen
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/09/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
10/09/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/15/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
11/20/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/23/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. Original copy not received, call Counsel and requested signed copy.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Withdraw AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal