judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OKACHAWA IWENGU V. TAKOMA PARK BAPTIST CHURCH

Case Information: 11-CV-0178
Short Caption:OKACHAWA IWENGU V. TAKOMA PARK BAPTIST CHURCHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB19933-10Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOkechukwu Iweogu NPro SeN
AppelleeTakoma Park Baptist ChurchN
Stephen O. HesslerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 2, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY-
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Appellant's Motion to Stay.
03/24/2011TMC - appellant's motion to stay - oppo
03/24/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987)... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO FILE HIS SRT NO LATER THAN MARCH 21, 2011 and has failed to comply, SHALL W/N 10 DAYS from the date of this order, complete and file a single copy of the SRT...SEE HARDCOPY (RDKRTE) (jl)
04/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 24, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 10 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
04/13/2011DISMISSED
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED