judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4519
A-4519
02/16/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MARY E. DIMMITT
DEAN P. DIMMITT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/30/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/18/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1954Response to Motion filed
04/22/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/30/1954Response to Brief filed
03/18/1954Reply to Response
02/27/1954Response to Petition
02/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/16/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dean P. DimmittRespondent
Mary E. DimmittPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information