judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AARON STARKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0159
Short Caption:AARON STARKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5748-10Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAaron Starks Y
Paul J. RileyNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Paul Riley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Paul Riley, Esquire
04/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of Fwbruary 24, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (121pgs/Tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/CD
04/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
04/18/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
04/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statement re transcript.
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
05/24/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) w/brief attached Held in Abeyance
06/07/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall NO LATER THAN JUNE 30, 2011, file any response showing with specificity any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of court-appointed counsel to withdraw is HELD IN ABEYANCE. (BY: ETW)
06/07/2011TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
07/29/2011FiledGranted motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
07/29/2011FiledAffirmed (ORDER) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
08/31/2011FiledMandate