judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36414
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41365 , 47769 , 49447 , 68187 , 68187-COA , 71469 , 71469-COA , 79756 , 79756-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162028Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/07/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-12045
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-12276
08/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13435
08/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 00-14551
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-19512
11/13/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 13, 2000. 00-19783
11/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts Requested: 10/12/99; 11/30/99; 12/08/99; 01/05/00; 01/26/00; 02/02/00; 02/14/00; 03/15/00; 04/19/00; 04/25/00; 04/28/00; 05/09/00; and 06/13/00. Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook/L. Makowski. 00-20227
12/11/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/12/99, 11/30/99, 12/08/99, 01/05/00, 01/26/00, 02/02/00, 02/14/00, 03/15/00, 04/25/00, 04/26/00, 04/27/00, 04/28/00 and 05/09/00. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 00-21649
12/12/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 19, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 00-21688
12/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21774
01/08/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 13, 2000. Court Reporter: Marcia Harness. 01-00346
01/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 01-00736
02/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 13, 2000, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief to and including January 12, 2001. As that date has already passed, we deny appellant's December 13, 2000, motion as moot. On January 12, 2001, appellant filed a second motion for an extension of time. We grant appellant's motion. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. On November 17, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts by court reporters Mary Beth Cook and Lisa Makowski. To date, all requested transcripts, except for transcripts of proceedings conducted on June 13, 2000, have been filed with this court. However, because appellant stated in his January 12, 2001, motion that he 'has received all the transcripts needed', no further transcripts need be filed with this court. 01-02598
02/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-00736
02/22/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 02/21/01. 01-03321
02/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-03323
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion as Moot. On February 12, 2001, appellant filed a motion for a fourth extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix. As we have already entered an order granting appellant to and including February 20, 1001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix, we deny appellant's February 12, 2001, motion as moot. fn1[Appellant's opening brief and appendix were received and filed on February 22, 2001.] 01-04386
03/26/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05218
04/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 45 days requested. 01-06823
04/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before June 7, 2001. 01-06898
06/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-09575
06/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 8, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including July 7, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion. 01-09814
07/10/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/10/01. 01-11572
11/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18613
11/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
02/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-02824
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02906
03/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. 02-02906