judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMIE WONG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0105)
Case Number:S-11-0105Case Docketed On:04/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JAMIE WONG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMIE WONG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJamie WongDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/06/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
06/16/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
06/16/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
06/16/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecution, Nunc Pro Tunc. Previous order entered had wrong docket number on the order.OrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
07/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal