judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

U.S. INSURANCE COMPANY OF WACO, TEXAS v. C. E. BOYER

Case: A-4538
A-4538
03/03/1954
Application for Writ of Error
U.S. INSURANCE COMPANY OF WACO, TEXAS
C. E. BOYER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/11/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/08/1954Errata FiledPetitioner
03/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/10/1955Letter Filed
07/07/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/01/1954Opinion issued
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/11/1954Response to Petition
03/08/1954Errata Filed
03/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/03/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. E. BoyerRespondent
U.S. Insurance Company of Waco, TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information