judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAMAU S. BLAKNEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0158
Short Caption:KAMAU S. BLAKNEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17207-09Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/2013
Argued/Submitted:06/25/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKamau S. Blakney Y
Rachel McKenzieNN
Brooke DaleyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Stephen F. RickardYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89 pgs/Rogers) 10/4/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (165 pgs/Rogers) 10/6/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (154 pgs/Zamora) 10/7/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (207 pgs/Rogers) 10/13/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (165 pgs/Zamora) 10/14/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (99 pgs/Zamora) 10/18/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (185 pgs/Zamora) 10/19/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (33 pgs/Maddox) 10/20-21/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (20 pgs/tape) 1/14/11 proc. w/cd
05/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/26/2011RECORD INDEX
05/26/2011RECORD COPIES
05/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (SEALED pleadings)
06/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 19, 2011. (Castillo)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 12/19/11
12/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/19/12.
03/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief by 6/18/12. (Appellant)
05/25/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw and for this court to appoint new counsel (Appellant)Granted
07/10/2012FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel
08/28/2012FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Daley) (Appellant)
08/28/2012FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Lenning) (Appellant)
09/10/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Lenning) (Appellant) Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Daley) (Appellant) and the Clerk shall enter the appearances of Nicholas Lenning, Esquire, and Brooke Daley, Esquire, pro hace vice, on behalf of appellant.
10/02/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From (Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP)
10/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/14/12
12/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/21/12
12/21/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/21/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/11/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 2/22/13
02/22/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/22/2013FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/12/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 4/19/13
03/14/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/21/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/19/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/25/2013FiledArgued Before Judges, Fisher, Thompson, Farrell, Brooke Daley Esq., for appellant. Stephen F. Rickard Esq.,for appellee.
07/09/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/31/2013FiledMandate