judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDY LEE LOVATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0104)
Case Number:S-11-0104Case Docketed On:04/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ANDY LEE LOVATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDY LEE LOVATO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndy Lee LovatoElisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Sue Chatfield

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 10
Citation:269 P.3d 426

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/20/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina OlsonMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/23/2011Order - Other - Order Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
06/07/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/28/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/12/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/14/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sue Chatfield for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/12/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/10/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas for appellant; Sue Chatfield, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/21/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal