judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYNN (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36413
Short Caption:WYNN (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39388
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157606Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12043
08/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. From appointment: enter appearance 10 days. [fn 1] All filing dealines, including those set forth in NRAP 9, NRAP 14, and NRAP 321(a)(1), shall commence to run from the date on which is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court. 00-14561
09/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Clark County Public Defender-Robert L. Miller, Deputy. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-15825
09/27/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-17062
09/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/15/99; 4/3/00; Trial commencing 4/4/00 and ending 4/10/00 and 6/5/00. To Court Reporters: Maureen Shcorn and Sharleen Nicholson. 00-17063
10/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/3/00; (4/4/00; 4/5/00; 4/6/00; 4/10/00 - 1 volume); 4/5/00; 4/6/00; 4/10/00 and 6/5/00. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 00-18916
11/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-20255
01/09/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 4, 2001. 01-00452
02/06/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-02369
02/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before March 6, 2001. 01-02528
03/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-05245
03/29/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on March 26, 2001. 01-05462
03/29/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 01-05246
03/29/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-05247
05/01/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-07258
05/01/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Contains SEALED Presentence Report. 01-07259
06/01/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-09149
06/01/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal. 'ORDER this matter REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09816
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10330
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10330