judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUEN VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 29991
Short Caption:BRUEN VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 19346BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/18/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/18/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
06/18/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered after 4 p.m.)
06/18/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered after 4 p.m.)
07/15/1997MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including July 25, 1997, to file the answering brief.
07/25/1997MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Transmittal of Original Exhibits Under NRAP 30 (d).
07/25/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (hand delivered).
07/25/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 3.
07/29/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order file the required documents of show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellants counsel. Due items: docketing statement; transcript request form or certificate of no transcript.
08/08/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/11/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Post-Conviction Hearing--7/3/96. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder.
08/27/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/27/97).
09/19/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny respondent's motion for transmittal of original exhibits.
02/15/2000Other Other. Case resubmitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this day. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
02/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2 [We further conclude that Bruen has not shown that he was prejudiced by his first four assignments of alleged ineffectiveness.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. 00-22757
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06618
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2000. 00-06618