Case Information: 11-CF-0174 | |||
Short Caption: | HENRY EUGENE WILSON V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-22587-09 | Filed Date: | 02/14/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/14/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | 03/05/2012 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/20/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/21/2012 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Henry Eugene Wilson | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
02/14/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
02/25/2011 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Marc L. Resnick, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC) | |||
02/25/2011 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Marc L. Resnick, Esquire | |||
03/10/2011 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii) | |||
03/18/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (31 pgs/Ronan) 8/30/10 proc. w/cd | |||
03/24/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
03/24/2011 | RECORD COPIES | |||
04/11/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (25 pgs/tape) 1/21/11 proc. w/cd | |||
04/21/2011 | APPEARANCE - of Douglas Evans as retained counsel for aplt. | |||
05/05/2011 | ORDERED, sus aponte, that the appointment of Marc L. Resnick, Esquire, is hereby vacated. Marc L. Resnick, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-retained counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) | |||
05/23/2011 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS | |||
06/20/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 6, 2011 (unopposed) | |||
07/28/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to file appellant's brief. F/O that the motion to withdraw for business reasons is denied as moot. F/O directing the appendix in 15 days and the appellee's brief 30 days thereafter. | ||
07/28/2011 | Filed | Appellant's Brief (no appendix) | ||
10/05/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte that this appeal is hereby dismissed. | ||
10/05/2011 | Withdrawn | Dismissed | ||
10/31/2011 | Filed | Notice Received Requesting that appeal be reinstated. (Appellant) | ||
11/08/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's Motion To Reinstate Appeal and appointing Nancy Allen, Esquire | ||
11/08/2011 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Nancy Allen, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
12/13/2011 | Filed | Motion To Strike - the brief filed by previous counsel and request for 60 days to file brief and appendix on behalf of aplt (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/19/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's motion to strike and granting appellant's request for an extension of time to file the brief. | ||
02/03/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
02/03/2012 | Filed | Appendix (attached to brief) (Appellant) | ||
03/05/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
03/05/2012 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/20/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
05/01/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
06/20/2012 | Filed | Submitted to Judges Glickman, Oberly, Newman | ||
07/20/2012 | Filed | Remanded (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges and Newman, Senior Judge) | ||
07/31/2012 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | ||
08/21/2012 | Filed | Mandate | ||
11/17/2014 | Filed | Motion To Recall The Mandate OR in the Alternative Motion for Relief from Judgment Under D.C. Code 23-110 (Appellant) | Denied | |
11/19/2014 | Filed | TMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE | ||
05/15/2015 | Filed | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE |