judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL ANGELO SENA, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0192)
Case Number:S-09-0192Case Docketed On:10/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL ANGELO SENA, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL ANGELO SENA, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Angelo Sena Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2010 WY 93
Citation:233 P.3d 993

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/17/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/29/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/09/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/16/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/19/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal