judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KYLE S. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0175
Short Caption:KYLE S. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD18891-10Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/28/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKyle S. Wilson Y
Vicki C. BryantYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Vickie Bryant, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Vickie Bryant, Esquire
03/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6pgs/Tape) 10/7/10 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 10/27/11 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8pgs/Tape) 1/11/11 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (141pgs/Tape) 2/3/11 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (35pgs/Tape) 2/7/11 proc. w/CD
04/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
05/25/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
05/25/2011RECEIVED - appdx (attached to brief)
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
07/15/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/15/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Denied
02/28/2012FiledSubmitted To Washingoton,Fisher,King
03/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
03/26/2012FiledMandate