judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODNEY GENE CHRISTENSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0193)
Case Number:S-09-0193Case Docketed On:10/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:RODNEY GENE CHRISTENSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RODNEY GENE CHRISTENSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRodney Gene ChristensenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2010 WY 95
Citation:234 P.3d 1229

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/17/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/17/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/02/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/20/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/20/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/22/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/21/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal