judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAWTHORNE(MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30919
Short Caption:HAWTHORNE(MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 96CR0165Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
08/22/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
08/22/1997Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal.
09/12/1997Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Appearance and Motion for Instructions.
09/12/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. For Enlargement of Time (First Request.) (Original and 2 copies--one returned.)
10/14/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Notice of Motion.
11/06/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Cause appearing, we grant attorney Sears' motion for guidance, but deny appellant's proper person motions without prejudice to counsel's right to refile any motion he deems warranted. Appellant shall have 15 days the date of this order to file a docketing statement and a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 1The fast track provision of NRAP 3C are inapplicable to this appeal.
11/24/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
11/24/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder.
02/17/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including March 17, 1998 to file the Opening Brief.
03/24/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Permission to File Late Appeal Brief and Request for Extension for to File. (MISSING DOCUMENT
03/26/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed March 24, 1998. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before March 31, 1998.
03/30/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/30/98).
04/30/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/30/98.)
05/01/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix.
11/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The district court clerk shall, within 5 days of the date of this order, certify and transmit a complete record on appeal to this court. The record shall include all documents filed in the district court proceedings.
11/16/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies). Hand delivered 11/16/99.
02/15/2000Other Other. Case resubmitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this day. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
02/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08767
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10288
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-10288