judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NIEVES ROCHA V. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP., ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0165
Short Caption:NIEVES ROCHA V. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP., ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Vehicle Cases (CAV)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAA838-09Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNieves Rocha N
Daniel A. BrownNY
Eileen M. O'BrienNY
AppelleeGeorgia-Pacific CorporationN
Robin Silver NN
AppelleeUnion Carbide CorporationN
Steven J. Parrott NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 ( 22-pgs/tape 12/-21/10 proc.) w/cd (transfered to 11cv651)
02/18/2011RECORD INDEX
02/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
03/21/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 2/28/11
03/24/2011 On consideration of this court's February 28, 2011 order..., the response thereto, wherein appellant CONCEDES to the court's assessment, it is ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED as having been PREMATURELY FILED. See DC Code 11-721 (2001)... (BY: ETW) LW
03/24/2011DISMISSED
04/14/2011MANDATE ISSUED