judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DR. MARK MENOLASCINO v. DAVID COON, GAIL JENSEN, RUSSELL MAGARITY, SUSAN MAGARITY, and DEBRA DAVIS

Case Heading (S-11-0114)
Case Number:S-11-0114Case Docketed On:05/05/2011
Linked To: S-11-0113 , S-11-0115 , S-11-0116
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:DR. MARK MENOLASCINO v. DAVID COON, GAIL JENSEN, RUSSELL MAGARITY, SUSAN MAGARITY, and DEBRA DAVIS
Full Title:DR. MARK MENOLASCINO, Appellant (Proposed Intervenor), v. DAVID COON, GAIL JENSEN, RUSSELL MAGARITY, SUSAN MAGARITY, and DEBRA DAVIS, Appellees (Petitioners).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark MenolascinoStuart R. Day
Keith J. Dodson
Brian James Marvel
AppelleeDavid CoonPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeGail JensenPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeRussell MagarityPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeSusan MagarityPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeDebra DavisElizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Civil Procedure, Planning and Zoning
Opinion Number:2012W 5
Citation:268 P.3d 258

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Kite.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/18/2011Motion - Consolidate with S-11-0016MotionConsolidateFinal
05/18/2011Order - Brief/scheduling - Order requesting briefing on procedural and jurisdictional issuesOrderBrief/schedulingFinal
05/18/2011Order - Consolidating cases - Order granting motion to consolidate appeals (Consolidating S-11-0114 & S-11-116 for briefing; and consolidating with cases S-11-0113- & S-11-0115 for oral argument (if any) and decision).OrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Self-address envelope included, no service copy provided)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/23/2011Event - Phone Call requesting signed original of Motion for Extension of TimeEventPhone CallFinal
06/23/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from Nicole Krieger, counsel for Board of County Commissioners, indicating that the county does not intend to file a brief, and she may be filing a motion to dismiss party to remove the county from the case.EventPhone CallFinal
08/11/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee Debra Davis (on all four cases). E-filing may be viewed on case S-11-0113.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/16/2011Brief - Appellees (Coon, Jensen, Magarity & Magarity).BriefAppelleeFinal
08/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees David Coon, Gail Jensen, Russell Magarity and Susan Magarity; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Order - Grant - extension of time for Appellee Debra Davis on all four cases. Electronic version can be viewed in S-11-0113.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/23/2011Motion - Dismiss party - Board of County Commissioners.MotionDismiss partyFinal
08/23/2011Brief - Failure to file - Appellee Board of County Commissioners, Teton County, WyomingBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
08/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee/Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Board of County Commissioners, Teton County, Wyoming, as PartyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2011Order - Dismissing party, Board of County CommissionersOrderDismissing partyFinal
09/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/30/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/05/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record, Transcripts & Attachments; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/12/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/09/2011Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
01/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and dismissing in part, District Judge Waldrip writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal