judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARVEY (WESLEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36424
Short Caption:HARVEY (WESLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 8866Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12178
07/25/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Theodore C. Herrera shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-12830
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Cousnel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-16865
12/28/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Herrera has failed to respond to this court's order filed September 25, 2000. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Herrera shall personally pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library within 20 days of the date of this order. Further, Herrera shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Herrera should not be sanctioned further. (Order mailed to attorney Herrera by regular and certified mail.) 00-22643
01/12/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. from attorney Theodore C. Herrara. $100 mailed to the Supreme Court Law Library on January 10, 2001. 01-00798
01/19/2001Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. On January 12, 2001, this court received Herrera's certificate of payment of the $100. Sanction, but Herrera has failed to file a fast track statement or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. We conclude that Herrera's failure to comply with this court's orders and NRAP 3C warrants additional sanctions in the sum of $250.00. Herrera shall personally pay the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and shall provide to the clerk of this court within 15 days from the date of this order an affidavit or certificate verigying that payment has been made. Herrera shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in this appeal within 10 days of the date of this order, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. (Order mailed to attorney Herrera by first class and certified mail.) 01-01220
02/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Certificate of Payment. 01-02234
03/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 8, 2001, this court received the fast track statement and joint appendix. Although counsel for appellant has not filed a motion for leave to file the fast track statement late, we elect to file the untimely fast track statement. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and joint appendix provisionally submitted on February 8, 2001, and the fast track response received on February 12, 2001. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that continue failure to file documents in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-05242
03/26/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-02655
03/26/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix to Fast Track Appeal. 01-02656
03/26/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-02764
05/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08286
06/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08450
06/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2001. 01-08450