judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTIN FREEMAN, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0166
Short Caption:MARTIN FREEMAN, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-1219 Consolidated: 10-CV-1510 , 10-CV-1511 , 11-CV-0166, 11-CV-0183 , 11-CV-0324
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2153-05Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMartin Freeman N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantSean Mclaughlin N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantDuane Fowler N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantRobert Grooms N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantTheodore Anderson N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantHilliard Dean N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantAntonio Williams N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantBilly Robin N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppellantFraternal Order of Polic, Mpd Labor Committee(the)N
Anthony M. ContiNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/23/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and on further consideration of this court's order of January 10, 2011, which consolidated appeal no. 10-CV-1511, with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1219 and 10-CV-1510, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-166, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CV-166 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1219, 10-Cv-1510 and 10-CV-1511 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/23/2011RECORD INDEX (1219, 1510, 1511 & 11cv166
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#17 (152-pgs/wood 4/15/10 proc.)
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#18 (133-pgs/OTT 8/11/10 proc.)
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#19 (55-pgs/OTT 8/11/10 proc.)w/cd
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/01/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for appeals nos. 11-CV-183 and 11-CV-324, and it further appearing that complete records on appeal have been filed with this court, it is (MORE)
04/01/2011 ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-183 and 11-CV-324 are consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1219, 10-Cv-1510, 10-Cv-1511 & 11-CV-166 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
04/01/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including opening brief of cross appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellants/cross- appellees Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellants/cross-appellees, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellants/cross-appellees. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/11/2011APPENDIX (Volume I & II)
06/09/2011APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (D.C.)
06/20/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to the motion of the aple cross aplt to enlarge the dealine for filing its brief for and additional 60 days
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellee/cross- appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee/cross-appellant's brief shall be filed on or before August 12, 2011. (ETW) elp
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
08/24/2011FiledOpposition cross aple to the secon motion of the aple/cross aplt d.c. to enlarge the deadline for filing its brief for an additional 30 days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
09/19/2011FiledOpposition - to aple/corss aplt's motion for enlargement of time for an additional three days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
09/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and the lodged supplemental joint appendix (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant) w/ supplemental joint appendix (two separate pleadings) elp
10/06/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin)
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/27/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)
11/10/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
11/10/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Easterly, Epstein
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Judges Glickman, Easterly, Epstein0
11/29/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Anderson, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Dean, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fowler, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Fraternal Order of Police Metropoltian Police, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Freeman, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Grooms, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Robin, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Williams)Denied
03/14/2013FiledOrder Denying appellants/cross-appellee's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
03/22/2013FiledMandate