judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AARNO LIUKSILA V. CLAIRE LIUKSILA

Case Information: 09-FM-0156
Short Caption:AARNO LIUKSILA V. CLAIRE LIUKSILAClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2408-08Filed Date:02/13/2009

Opening Event Date:02/13/2009Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/29/2009Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/2010
Argued/Submitted:10/27/2010
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAarno Liuksila N
Edward G. VarroneYY
AppelleeClaire Liuksila N
Rebecca C. Shankman YN
Darryl A. FeldmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/13/2009NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/27/2009 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 13, 2009, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GP)
06/15/2009STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 9/25/09 12/10/08 (rt. ordered/needed)
07/29/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (20 pgs/tape) 9/25/08 proc. w/CD.
07/29/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (205 pgs/tape) 12/10/08 proc.
07/29/2009RECORD COMPLETED
08/03/2009 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
08/03/2009RECORD INDEX
09/14/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 10/15/09
09/18/2009 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before October 15, 2009. (GP)
10/20/2009APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to late file motion for ext of time to file aplt's brief and motion for ext of time to file brief. no oppo
10/26/2009 On considerationof appellant's combined consentmotion for leave to late file and consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's brief and appendix shall be filed on or before November 16, 2009. (GP)
11/20/2009 On consideration of this court's order of October 26, 2009, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix on or before November 16, 2009, and it appearing that the brief and appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (GP)
12/10/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
12/10/2009RECEIVED Appellant's Brief
12/10/2009RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief.
12/30/2009 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court on or before January 19, 2010. (GP)
12/30/2009APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/30/2009APPENDIX
01/14/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 2/19/10
01/20/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 19, 2010. (GP)
02/16/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 5, 2010 (no oppo)
02/22/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 5, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (GP)
03/05/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/05/2010APPENDIX- aple
03/05/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/26/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
08/25/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
10/27/2010FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/27/2010SUBMITTED to Judges Thompson, Newman, King
10/27/2010AFFIRMED MOJ (Thompson, Newman, King)
11/18/2010MANDATE ISSUED