judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4518
A-4518
02/16/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF TEAGUE
W. F. STILES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/05/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/03/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/06/1954Motion to dismissFiling granted
05/05/1954Motion for RehearingDismissed
03/03/1954Reply to Response
02/24/1954Response to Petition
02/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/16/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. F. Stiles, et al.Respondent
CITY OF TEAGUEPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information